Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/09/2021 at 22:27:36 (UTC).

Neal v. First American Title Co.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Neal filed an Other lawsuit against First American Title Co. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8770

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Sixth Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Ralph B. Neal

San Jose, CA 95127

Defendant and Respondent

First American Title Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

James Jose Ramos

Attorney at Wright Finley Zak LLP

4665 Macarthur Ct #280

Newport Beach, CA 92707

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Ralph Neal, filed 1/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant