This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/14/2021 at 21:15:54 (UTC).

NCC Venture I, LLC v. Northern California Carpenters Regional Council

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 NCC Venture I, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Northern California Carpenters Regional Council. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Langhorne-Johnson, Monique. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0779

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Langhorne-Johnson, Monique

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

NCC Venture I, LLC

Defendant and Appellant

Northern California Carpenters Regional Council

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Geoffrey Keith Willis

Gregory Eric Woodard

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Matthew John Gauger

Andrea C. Matsuoka

Ezekiel Daystar Carder

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final (filed 9/23/2020 in superior court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: M. Gauger and A. Matsuoka, counsel for appellant, re: On September 8, 2020, the Civil Case Information Statement was filed without a copy of the order or judgment being appealed, which is required. On that same date a default notice for failure to include a copy of the order or judgement was served to you via TrueFiling. The due date to cure the default notice was September 23, 2020. Within 7 days from the date of the email if a copy of the order or judgment is not received, the dismissal order pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g), will be prepared.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: needs copy of order or judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Matthew Gauger, attorney for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Northern California Carpenters Regional Council Attorney: Matthew John Gauger Matthew Gauger, attorney for appellant, w/o copy of order or judgment attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid; R155171;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Northern California Carpenters Regional CouncilAttorney: Matthew John Gauger; Notes: Matthew Gauger, attorney for appellant, w/o copy of order or judgment attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 08/17/2020. Designating CT with RT(2 vols attached).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/07/2020 by Counsel for Defendant Northern California Carpenters Regional Council appealing judgment from 06/09/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Napa County Superior Court - Main; County: Napa; Trial Court Case Number: 18CV001415; Trial Court Judge: Langhorne-Johnson, Monique

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less