This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2023 at 00:36:08 (UTC).

Nazaryan v. Femtometrix, Inc et al.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Nazaryan filed an Other lawsuit against Femtometrix, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gooding, Martha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2027

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gooding, Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Hovik Nazaryan

Appellants and Defendants

Femtometrix, Inc

Alon Raphael

Tyler Rubin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Alfred Shaumyan

Attorney at SDA Law Group P.C.

535 N Brand Blvd Ste 280

Glendale, CA 91203

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Jason L Liang

Attorney at Liang Ly LLP

601 S Figueroa St Ste 1950

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3983

Joshua David Schein

Attorney at Schein Law Group, A Professional Corpora

2029 Century Park E Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2905

David E. Hackett

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Gary Jason Wax

Attorney at Greines Martin Stein & Richland

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: M. Webb, M. Cooper, S. Montgomery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/13/2022 - Proceeding by rule 8.124 with RT's

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: On November 28, 2022, the parties filed a stipulated motion to consolidate case numbers G061412 and G062027. The motion to consolidate is GRANTED. Case numbers G061412 and G062027 are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including record preparation, briefing, oral argument, and decision. Case number G061412 shall be the lead case number and all filings shall include both case numbers. The parties' stipulated motion further proposes that the briefing schedule already approved in case number G061412 shall remain in place, as modified to allow for the filing of the reporter's transcript designated for case number G062027. Accordingly, the court ORDERS the following briefing schedule. (1) Defendants, appellants, and cross-respondents Femtometrix, Inc., Alon Raphael, and Tyler Rubin (defendants) shall serve and file their consolidated appendix and opening brief within 40 days after the reporter's transcript has been filed for case number G062027. (2) Plaintiff, respondent, and cross-appellant Hovik Nazaryan (plaintiff) shall serve and file a consolidated and combined respondent's brief and cross-appellant's opening brief (and any appendix) within 30 days after the brief described in paragraph 1 is filed. (3) Defendants (including here cross-respondents Brian Larzelere and Tom Rolfes, who have not filed an appeal but are cross-respondents represented by the same counsel as the other defendants) shall serve and file a consolidated and combined appellants' reply brief and cross-respondents' brief within 30 days after the brief described in paragraph 2 is filed. (4) Plaintiff may serve and file a cross-appellant's reply brief within 20 days after the brief described in paragraph 3 is filed. The parties may stipulate to or apply for briefing extensions as provided for in the California Rules of Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Parties' stipulation to consolidate appeals G061412 & G062027 and revise briefing schedule.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Schein Law Group and Liang Ly, LLP counsel for appellants associate in David E. Hackett and Gary J. Wax from the law firm of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP as co-cousels.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLTS: Femtometrix, Inc, Alon Raphael and Tyler RubinAlso appealing 09/21/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-00979038; Trial Court Judge: Gooding, Martha

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Femtometrix, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Jason Wax

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Eric Hackett