This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/24/2023 at 00:44:14 (UTC).

Nazarians et al. v. City of Los Angeles et al.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Nazarians filed an Other lawsuit against City of Los Angeles. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Crowfoot, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2088

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Crowfoot, William

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Andreh Nazarians

Angel Movses

Respondents and Defendants

City of Los Angeles

Nicholas Virzi

Jenyffer del Rio Ortega

Michael Martinez

Axcel Mannoury

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben Jared Meiselas

Jose Daniel Tapetillo

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Sara Ugaz

Michael N. Feuer

Kevin Ellsworth Gilbert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 06/23/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: THREE: Clerks (676 Pages), ONE: reporter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 8, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Andreh Nazarians Attorney: Ben Jared Meiselas Attorney: Jose Daniel Tapetillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Angel Movses Attorney: Ben Jared Meiselas Attorney: Jose Daniel Tapetillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 06/23/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Andreh NazariansAttorney: Ben Jared Meiselas Attorney: Jose Daniel Tapetillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Angel Movses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Andreh NazariansAttorney: Ben Jared Meiselas Attorney: Jose Daniel Tapetillo Plaintiff and Appellant: Angel MovsesAttorney: Ben Jared Meiselas Attorney: Jose Daniel Tapetillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Sara Ugaz of Los Angeles City Attorney's Office substitutes in for Ty Ford, Cory Michael Brente, and James P. Clark as counsel for respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #30527 for $775 (Geragos & Geragos)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 15, 2022 by Andreh Nazarians

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV05665; Trial Court Judge: Crowfoot, William

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less