This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/28/2023 at 17:02:23 (UTC).

MUSSO & FRANK GRILL CO. v. MITSUI SUMITOMO INSURANCE USA

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 MUSSO FRANK GRILL CO filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against MITSUI SUMITOMO INSURANCE USA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4791

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Musso & Frank Grill Co., Inc.

Respondent and Defendant

Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Ross Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Danica L. Crittenden

Michael J. Bidart

Ricardo Echeverria

Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich

Steven Schuetze

Reid M. Ehrlich

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Kent R. Keller

Spencer Young Kook

Cara Vecchione

Jeffrey M. Beyer

Brian O'Donnell

Maura C. Smith

Not Yet Classified Attorney

David B. Goodwin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review denied. The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter from David B. Goodwin, counsel for pub/depub requestor Ross Stores, Inc. re newly decided authority supporting request of depublcation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including August 25, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc., Defendant and Respondent Maura C. Smith, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Musso & Frank Grill Co., Inc. Attorney: Michael J. Bidart

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Ross Stores, Inc. Attorney: David B. Goodwin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance USA Inc. Attorney: Brian O'Donnell Attorney: Spencer Young Kook

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Musso & Frank Grill Co., Inc. Attorney: Michael J. Bidart

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B310499; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV16681

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less