This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/25/2022 at 01:09:24 (UTC).

Musighi v. Mossighi

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Musighi filed an Other lawsuit against Mossighi. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kleifield, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0927

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kleifield, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Appellant

Isaac Musighi

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Respondent

Parviz "Daniel" Mossighi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorneys

Glenn T. Rosen

149 S. Barrington Avenue Suite 207

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Lawrence Craig Ecoff

Attorney at Ecoff Campain & Tilles, LLP

280 S. Beverly Drive, Suite 504

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Alberto Javier Campain

Attorney at Ecoff Law LLP

280 S. Beverly Dr. Suite 504

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Respondent Attorneys

Dawn Britt Eyerly

Attorney at Freeman, Freeman & Smiley, LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Curtis A. Graham

Attorney at Freeman Freeman & Smiley, LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Isaac Musighi Attorney: Glenn T. Rosen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Isaac MusighiAttorney: Glenn T. Rosen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Respondent: Parviz "Daniel" Mossighi Attorney: Curtis A. Graham One extension granted for a total of 47 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Respondent: Parviz "Daniel" MossighiAttorney: Curtis A. Graham; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 47 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: an RBF was due by 11/14/21;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Volumes 1 through 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Isaac Musighi re suspension of prior counsel, Glenn Rosen;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Isaac Musighi Attorney: Lawrence Craig Ecoff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Lawrence C. Ecoff substitutes in for appellant Isaac Musighi;

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: an AOB/appendix was due by 4/26/21;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Isaac Musighi Attorney: Glenn T. Rosen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Isaac MusighiAttorney: Glenn T. Rosen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Isaac Musighi.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: appellant's notice filed in trial court on 3/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 2/2/2021 by Isaac Musighi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCP01325; Trial Court Judge: Kleifield, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EYERLY DAWN B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM CURTIS A. ESQ.