This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/12/2022 at 01:27:11 (UTC).

Munoz v. Soto

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Munoz filed an Other lawsuit against Soto. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cotton, Jr., Huey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2852

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cotton, Jr., Huey

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Gabriel Munoz

Respondents and Defendants

Jorge Soto

Jorge Luis Soto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Jay S. Bloom

Attorney at Law Offices of Jay Bloom

6320 Canoga Ave. 15Th Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Craig B. Forry

Attorney at Forry Law Group LLP

15501 San Fernando Mission Blvd. Suite 309

Mission Hills, CA 91345

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Craig B. Forry for Respondent. 2 mins.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Jay S. Bloom, appellant's counsel - argue, 15 minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Wednesday, May 18, 2022 at 1:30 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Gabriel Munoz Attorney: Jay S. Bloom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Gabriel MunozAttorney: Jay S. Bloom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Jorge Luis Soto Attorney: Craig B. Forry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Jorge Luis SotoAttorney: Craig B. Forry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Gabriel Munoz Attorney: Jay S. Bloom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Gabriel MunozAttorney: Jay S. Bloom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Opening Brief rejected for lack of bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (109 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Gabriel Munoz Attorney: Jay S. Bloom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Gabriel MunozAttorney: Jay S. Bloom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 4, 2021: 8.122 no RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #306 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed May 14, 2021 by Gabriel Munoz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20VECV00626; Trial Court Judge: Cotton, Jr., Huey

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORRY CRAIG B.