This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 00:22:40 (UTC).

Mungovan et al. v. City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Mungovan filed an Other lawsuit against City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schulman, Ethan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6619

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schulman, Ethan

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Stephen Mungovan

Christopher Grady

Respondents and Defendants

City and County of San Francisco

Rosemary Bosque

Micki Callahan

Steven Ponder

Linda Simon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen F. Henry

2625 Alcatraz Avenue #615

Berkeley, CA 94705

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Amy D Super

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1390 Market Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-2(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Transmittal sheet from SF Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 11/21/2022; designating 8.124 with RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephen Mungovan Attorney: Stephen F. Henry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS - You must attach to this form a copy of the judgment or order being appealed that shows the date it was entered (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104 for definition of"entered").

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 03/15/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephen MungovanAttorney: Stephen F. Henry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephen MungovanAttorney: Stephen F. Henry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 12/5/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1066 - Henry Lacey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 11/09/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiffs Stephen Mungovan and Christopher Grady appealing judgment from 09/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC19580374; Trial Court Judge: Schulman, Ethan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less