This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/12/2023 at 09:03:44 (UTC).

Mullins et al. v. Clarizio

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Mullins filed an Other lawsuit against Clarizio. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurst, Linda. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7330

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hurst, Linda

 

Party Details

Respondents, Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Ron Mullins

Vickie Mullins

Second Press, Inc.

John Clarizio

Appellant, Not Yet Classified and Defendant

Esperanza Hansen

Tulare, CA 93274

Respondents, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Second Press, Inc.

John Clarizio

Esperanza Hansen

Tulare, CA 93274

Arnulfo Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Malek

Attorney at Malek & Malek

1 Sansome Street Suite 3500

San Francisco, CA 94104

Martin Moroski

Attorney at Adam Moroski Madden Cumberland & Green LLP

P.O. Box 3835

San Luis Obispo, CA 93403

Roy E. Ogden

Attorney at Ogden & Fricks LLP

656 Santa Rosa St. Suite 2B

San Luis Obispo, CA 93401

Respondent, Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Roy E. Ogden

Attorney at Ogden & Fricks LLP

656 Santa Rosa St. Suite 2B

San Luis Obispo, CA 93401

Justin Dennis Harris

Attorney at Harris Law Firm, PC

7110 N. Fresno St. 400

Fresno, CA 93720-989

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondents shall recover the cost on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Esperanza Hansen Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Esperanza HansenPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: 5/27/22 order served on aplt E. Hansen with current mailing address and telephone number; by J. Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: We grant counsel Justin D. Harris's motion for the firm of Harris Law Firm to be relieved as attorneys of record for appellant Esperanza Hansen. Counsel is directed to serve appellant with a copy of this order and submit proof of service to this court within (7) days, listing appellant's current or last known address, telephone number, and e-mail address. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before June 20, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: proposed order for motion to be relieved as counsel by counsel J. Harris for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Atty Martin Moroski SUBBED OUT for Resps. Ron & Vickie Mullins; Atty Jeffrey Malek SUBBED IN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Civil case information statement filed. Due on 03/21/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Civil case information statement filed. Requested for 03/21/2022 By 31 Day(s) and designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Civil case information statement filed. Due on 02/18/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Civil case information statement filed. Requested for 02/18/2022 By 30 Day(s) EOT for Designation of Record on Appeal and to file CIS by 2-18-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Case summary from SLOSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: dtd 1-4-22 to be cured 1-19-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 12-13-21 by aplt. Hansen; from 10-6-21 order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: 17CVP0030; Trial Court Judge: Hurst, Linda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: 18CVP0323; Trial Court Judge: Hurst, Linda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less