This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/21/2023 at 22:00:17 (UTC).

M.R. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 M R filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7993

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

M. R.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

A. V.

N. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Richard Thomas Swanson

Tracy Marie De Soto

Interested Party Attorneys

Saba Ahmed

Hannah Johl

Anna Jo Curry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Non-Operative Original Proceeding; Disposition Type: Final A writ petition pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.450(a) is available only from an order setting a Welfare and Institution Code section 366.26 hearing. The notice of intent filed in this case is not from such an order. Therefore, the notice of intent is ineffective, and no record shall be prepared.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: A writ petition pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.450(a) is available only from an order setting a Welfare and Institution Code section 366.26 hearing. The notice of intent filed in this case is not from such an order. Therefore, the notice of intent is ineffective, and no record shall be prepared. Robie, Acting P.J.; Renner, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: petitioner adding attorney Tracy De Soto.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 2/22/23. Record due: 3/14/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2020152; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less