This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/17/2022 at 01:11:55 (UTC).

Mortreux et al. v. Good Earthkeeping Organization, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Mortreux filed an Other lawsuit against Good Earthkeeping Organization, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lui, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2080

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lui, Christopher

 

Party Details

Appellants and Petitioners

Brigitte Mortreux

Jean-Pierre Mortreux

Respondents

Carol Winell

Good Earthkeeping Organization, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Mark S. Adams

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell , LLP

Three Park Plaza Ste 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Susan Allison

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP,

3 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Respondent Attorneys

Jonathan Lawrence Gerber

Attorney at Miller Miller Gerber LLP

18301 Von Karman Ave Ste 950

Irvine, CA 92612-190

Alejandro Sebastian Angulo

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker

611 Anton Blvd #1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1998

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Jean-Pierre Mortreux Attorney: Susan Allison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Jean-Pierre MortreuxAttorney: Susan Allison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Notes: Respondent: Carol Winell Attorney: Jonathan Lawrence Gerber

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketBrief: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Party Attorney: Respondent: Carol WinellAttorney: Jonathan Lawrence Gerber

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: RBF was due 03/17/2022Carol Winell, Respondent Jonathan Lawrence Gerber, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Respondent: Good Earthkeeping Organization, Inc. Attorney: Alejandro Sebastian Angulo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Respondent: Good Earthkeeping Organization, Inc.Attorney: Alejandro Sebastian Angulo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Jean-Pierre Mortreux Attorney: Susan Allison Petitioner and Appellant: Brigitte Mortreux Attorney: Susan Allison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Jean-Pierre MortreuxAttorney: Susan Allison Petitioner and Appellant: Brigitte MortreuxAttorney: Susan Allison

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (584 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Jean-Pierre Mortreux Attorney: Susan Allison Petitioner and Appellant: Brigitte Mortreux Attorney: Susan Allison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Jean-Pierre MortreuxAttorney: Susan Allison Petitioner and Appellant: Brigitte MortreuxAttorney: Susan Allison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by EFiling First Legal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Mar 30, 2021 by Jean-Pierre Mortreux and Brigitte Mortreux

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCP04171; Trial Court Judge: Lui, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOOD EARTHKEEPING ORGANIZATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALLISON SUSAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS MARK SAMUEL