This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/30/2022 at 14:11:40 (UTC).

Mori-Campbell v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Mori-Campbell filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Horn, Jr., H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5408

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Horn, Jr., H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Donna Mori-Campbell

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

AMC Entertainment, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael J. Libman

Attorney at Law Ofc Michael J. Libman

18321 Ventura Blvd Suite 700

Tarzana, CA 91356

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Chester H. Presiding Judge, Jr.

Attorney at Dept. I

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Karen Liao

Attorney at Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester

801 S Figueroa St 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Brian T. Moss

Attorney at Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez & Trester LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92612

Scott W. Davenport

Attorney at Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP

801 S. Figueroa Street 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate filed on September 30, 2021 has been read and considered, along with the parties' additional filings. The petition is denied for failure to establish entitlement to extraordinary relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate filed on September 30, 2021 has been read and considered, along with the parties' additional filings. The petition is denied for failure to establish entitlement to extraordinary relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Proposed order re: motion to augment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Petitioner's motion to augment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Preliminary opposition filed by RPI AMC Entertainment, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Petitioner's response to AMC's opposition letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Relief - Vol 3 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Relief - Vol 2 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Relief - Vol 1 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMC ENTERTAINMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVENPORT, SCOTT WM.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIAO KAREN