This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/09/2023 at 03:02:55 (UTC).

Mori-Campbell v. AMC Entertainment Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Mori-Campbell filed an Other lawsuit against AMC Entertainment Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Horn, Jr., H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1137

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Horn, Jr., H.

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Donna Mori-Campbell

Respondent and Defendant

AMC Entertainment Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Jacob Libman

Attorney at Law Of Michael J. Libman

18321 Ventura Blvd Suite 700

Tarzana, CA 91356

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Brian Todd Moss

Attorney at Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez & Trester LLP

695 Town Center Dr Ste 400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Karen Liao

Attorney at Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester

695 Town Center Dr, Ste 400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Donna Mori-Campbell Attorney: Michael Jacob Libman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Donna Mori-CampbellAttorney: Michael Jacob Libman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on May 9, 2022 by Donna Mori-Campbell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC632829; Trial Court Judge: Horn, Jr., H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMC ENTERTAINMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIAO KAREN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSS BRIAN T