This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/21/2022 at 14:06:28 (UTC).

MORGAN v. REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 MORGAN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6305

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Lee Ann Morgan

Santa Barbara, CA 93103

Respondents and Defendants

The Regents of the University of California

Jeffrey C. Wang, MD

Santa Monica UCLA Orthopedic Hospital and Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Vanessa M. Domenichelli

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Matthew Samuel Levinson

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Pub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & publication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing publication of the opinion is denied. Groban, J., was recused and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: JUSTICE RECUSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received additional record; Notes: One doghouse.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Lee Ann Morgan Pro Per Filed per 8.25(b)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Lee Ann Morgan Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311441; Disposition: Dismissed by opinion; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC452100

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vanessa M. Domenichelli

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINSON MATTHEW SAMUEL