This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/01/2020 at 18:41:52 (UTC).

MORENO v. VISSER RANCH

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 MORENO filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against VISSER RANCH. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3814

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Ray David Moreno

Defendants and Respondents

Graceland Dairy, Inc.

Visser Ranch, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Yigal Joshua Torem

Gary A. Dordick

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Zachary D. Rutman

Kevin S. Taylor

Jorge A. Martinez

John M. Roche

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Service copy of petition for review electronically filed on 1/29/19.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Visser Ranch, Inc. Attorney: Jorge A. Martinez Defendant and Respondent: Graceland Dairy, Inc. Attorney: Jorge A. Martinez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F075822; Disposition: Reversed in Full; Trial Court: Tulare County Superior Court - Main (Visalia); Trial Court Case Number: VCU254522

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less