This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/10/2021 at 05:31:36 (UTC).

Morales v. Chinn

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Morales filed an Other lawsuit against Chinn. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1479

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Jose Morales

Appellant and Defendant

William Chinn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Henry John Matusek

Attorney at O'Neil & Matusek LLP

14416 Hamlin Street Suite 200

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Brian M. Plessala

Attorney at Rifenbark & Wolf

9301 Oakdale Ave. Suite 220

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (March 23, 2021: William Chinn ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 paid via cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: March 23, 2021: William Chinn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC617423

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATUSEK HENRY JOHN II ESQ.