This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/10/2021 at 09:42:50 (UTC).

MONSTER v. BEATS ELECTRONICS

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 MONSTER filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against BEATS ELECTRONICS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4792

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants, Appellants and Plaintiffs

Noel Lee

Monster, LLC

Paul D. Wachter

Beats Electronics, LLC

HTC American Holding, Inc.

Cross Defendants and Respondents

Paul D. Wachter

Beats Electronics, LLC

HTC American Holding, Inc.

Other

Trustee of the Noel Lee Living Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Appellant, Plaintiff and Other Attorneys

Jeffrey Colin Berman

Attorney at Brown George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Marc Steven Nurik

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeffrey I. Ehrlich

Attorney at The Ehrlich Law Firm

237 West Fourth Street, 2Nd Floor

Claremont, CA 91711

Kirk Mitchell Hallam

Attorney at Law Offices of Kirk M. Hallam

201 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Kirk M. Hallam

Attorney at Law Offices of Kirk M. Hallam

201 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 300

Beverly Hills, CA 90401

Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich

Attorney at The Ehrlich Law Firm

237 West Fourth Street, 2Nd Floor

Claremont, CA 91711

Robert Leo DellAngelo

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark R Yohalem

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark R. Yohalem

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert L. Dell Angelo

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Edward H. Takashima

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP

401 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 850

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Theodore Joseph Boutrous

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 4600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Theano Evangelis

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

David Laurence Zifkin

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

401 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 850

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Meredith Richardson Dearborn

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

Theodore J. Boutrous

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Alisha C. Burgin

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

David J. Burman

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 10022

Cross Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Robert Leo DellAngelo

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark R Yohalem

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark R. Yohalem

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert L. Dell Angelo

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Edward H. Takashima

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP

401 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 850

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Theodore Joseph Boutrous

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 4600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Theano Evangelis

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

David Laurence Zifkin

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP

401 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 850

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Meredith Richardson Dearborn

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

Theodore J. Boutrous

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Alisha C. Burgin

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

David J. Burman

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 10022

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petitions for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petitions for review denied; Notes: The requests for judicial notice filed October 2, 2020, and November 2, 2020, are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Noel Lee Attorney: Kirk M. Hallam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Noel Lee Attorney: Kirk M. Hallam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Monster, LLC Attorney: Jeffrey I. Ehrlich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Cross-defendant and Respondent: Paul D. Wachter Attorney: Mark R. Yohalem Cross-defendant and Respondent: HTC American Holding, Inc. Attorney: Alisha C. Burgin Cross-defendant and Respondent: Beats Electronics, LLC Attorney: Theodore J. Boutrous All Defendants'answer to Noel Lee's petition for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Cross-defendant and Respondent: Paul D. Wachter Attorney: Mark R. Yohalem Cross-defendant and Respondent: HTC American Holding, Inc. Attorney: Alisha C. Burgin Cross-defendant and Respondent: Beats Electronics, LLC Attorney: Theodore J. Boutrous All Defendent's answer to Monster, LLC's petition for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Noel Lee Attorney: Kirk M. Hallam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: 2nd petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Noel Lee Attorney: Kirk M. Hallam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Monster, LLC Attorney: Jeffrey I. Ehrlich Formerly consolidated with petitioner's appeals in cases B288598, B290960, and B292951 based on the Court of Appeal orders filed on April 20, 2018; August 20, 2018; and November 7, 2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B288598 B290960 B292951 B285994 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC595235

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HTC America Holding, Inc. is a litigant