This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/18/2021 at 08:00:35 (UTC).

Monster, LLC et al. v. Beats Electronics, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Monster, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Beats Electronics, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fahey, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2570

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fahey, William

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Monster, LLC

Noel Lee

Respondents and Defendants

HTC America Holding, Inc.

Beats Electronics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Kirk Mitchell Hallam

Attorney at Law Offices of Kirk M. Hallam

201 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Alisha C. Burgin

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park E Ste 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Bobbie Jean Wilson

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

505 Howard St. Ste 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105-3222

Bradley J. Hamburger

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Theodore Joseph Boutrous, Jr.

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 4600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Theano Evangelis

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

David Laurence Zifkin

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

401 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 850

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Meredith Richardson Dearborn

Boies, Schiller & Flexner 1999 Harrison Street, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 13, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Monster, LLC Attorney: Kirk Mitchell Hallam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Monster, LLCAttorney: Kirk Mitchell Hallam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 392779 for $775.00 (L.A. Depositions, Inc.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 5/4/2021 by Monster, LLC and Noel Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC595235; Trial Court Judge: Fahey, William

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HTC America Holding, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MONSTER LLC is a litigant