This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/10/2022 at 05:24:44 (UTC).

Moises De Leon et al. v. Gary D. Nelson Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 Moises De Leon filed an Other lawsuit against Gary D Nelson Associates, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Riemer, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9141

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Riemer, Craig

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Moises De Leon

Joshua Landeros

George Hill

Respondent and Defendant

Gary D. Nelson Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew John Matern

Attorney at Matern Law Group, PC

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Launa Nicole Adolph

Attorney at Matern Law Group, PC

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Deanna Silva Leifer

Attorney at Matern Law Group, PC

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Tanja LaVonne Darrow

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

633 W 5Th Street, 63Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Appellants' counsel (Debra Tauger) re: abandonment has been filed with the superior court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Appellants motion to vacate dismissal and CCIS rec'd w/motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Appellants' CCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: By appellants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: 3rd amended; cease preparation of record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: 2nd amended dtd Jul 22, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended dtd Jul 21, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jul 20, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: dtd Jun 21, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jun 7, 2022; Moises De Leon et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1905472; Trial Court Judge: Riemer, Craig

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gary D. Nelson Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARROW TANJA LAVONNE