This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2023 at 09:06:13 (UTC).

Mohammadi et al. v. City of Fresno et al.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Mohammadi filed an Other lawsuit against City of Fresno. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3633

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Tharpe, D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Reza Mohammadi

Defendants and Appellants

City of Fresno

Steve Wallace

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Jeremy Michael Dobbins

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Mandy L. Jeffcoach

Scott W Davenport

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Resp Csl Dobbins - PA/15 Mins - July 3-17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: City of Fresno Attorney: Scott W Davenport Defendant and Appellant: Steve Wallace Attorney: Scott W Davenport

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Proof of Service rejected due to: incorrect court and trial court judge listed on POS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: City of FresnoAttorney: Scott W Davenport Defendant and Appellant: Steve WallaceAttorney: Scott W Davenport

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 3rd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 2nd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 1st

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: $390 paid via OnBase

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 1/11/22; CTX & RTXRespondent didn't file a designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All Counsel and Superior Court Re: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: atty Davenport obo applts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Davenport obo Applts City of Fresno et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Dobbins obo Respondent Mohammadi et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: all counsel - mediation questionnaires due in 15 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: City of Fresno is exempt from filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Scott Wm. Davenport/appellants City of Fresno and Steve Wallace from (1) The judgment entered on October 5, 2021, for which notice of entry was served on October 11, 2021; (2) The denial of the post-judgment motion for new trial, which was entered on December 2, 2021; and (3) The denial of the post-judgment motion for judgment notwithstanding verdict, which was entered on December 2, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 16CECG01808; Trial Court Judge: Tharpe, D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less