This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/12/2021 at 02:05:46 (UTC).

Moda v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Moda filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigle, Laura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8960

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Seigle, Laura

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kevin Moda

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Others

Mahvash Mazgani Family Trust

Wesson Trust

Interested Parties

Nazanin Mazgani

Mahvash Mazgani

Neyaz Mazgani

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John Toby Schreiber

Attorney at Law Offices of John T Schreiber

2127 Goldenhill Way

Benicia, CA 94510

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Laura Siegle

Attorney at Dept. 48

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Other and Interested Party Attorneys

Stephen Yoonkyu Ma

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP

6420 Wilshire Blvd 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Jeffrey Benjamin Isaacs

Attorney at Isaacs Friedberg & Labaton LLP

555 S Flower St Ste 4250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jerome H. Friedberg

Attorney at Isaacs Friedberg & Labaton LLP

555 S Flower St. Suite 4250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Akili Paul Nickson

Attorney at Isaacs Friedberg LLP

555 S. Flower Street Suite 4250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Eric Peter Early

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae

6420 Wilshire Blvd. 17Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Zachary Austin Gidding

Attorney at Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP

6420 Wilshire Blvd Fl 17

Los Angeles, CA 90048-5545

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The request for judicial notice is granted as to Exhibits C and D. Judicial notice is granted only concerning the existence, but not the accuracy, of factual allegations or findings made in these documents. The remainder of the request for judicial notice is denied. The petition for review is denied. [S266661]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S266661

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on November 23, 2020, the opposition filed on December 3, 2020, and the reply filed on December 7, 2020. Petitioner has failed to show the superior court erred or that he is otherwise entitled to extraordinary relief. Accordingly, the petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Preliminary Opposition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $390 Responsive Filing Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Real Party Mahvash Mazgani's Preliminary Opposition to Kevin Moda's Writ Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Page 14 of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 9 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 8 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 7 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 6 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 5 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 4 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 3 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 2 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate etc. - Vol 1 of 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Extraordinary Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T. Schreiber