This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/08/2021 at 10:06:33 (UTC).

M&N Financing Corporation et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles et al.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 M N Financing Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wiley Jr., John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0560

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wiley Jr., John

 

Party Details

Petitioners

M&N Financing Corporation

Mahmood Nasiry

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles

Hon. J. Shepard Wiley

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Department of Fair Employment and Housing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Chandler Adrian Parker

Attorney at Ivie, McNeill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Byron Michael Purcell

Attorney at Ivie, Mcneill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marie B Maurice

Attorney at Ivie McNeill & Wyatt

444 S Flower St 18Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Francisco Valenciana Balderrama

Attorney at Dept of Fair Employment & Housing

320 W 4Th St 10Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Olivia Ngoc Tran

Attorney at Department of Fair Employment & Housing

320 W 4Th St Fl 10

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed June 8, 2018. The petition is denied. The respondent court did not abuse its discretion in ordering monetary sanctions against petitioners and petitioners' counsel of record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: Petitioners' renewed request for an immediate stay of the respondent court's May 9, 2018, order imposing monetary sanctions is granted and effective until Monday, June 18, 2018, at 12:00 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.; Notes: ***STAY REQUESTED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Petitioners' request for immediate stay, filed June 8, 2018, is denied without prejudice. The alleged need for immediate relief appears to be of petitioners' own making, as the court issued the challenged ruling on May 9, 2018, and the petition was not filed until June 8, 2018, at 3:23 p.m. (See H.D. Arnaiz, Ltd. v. County of San Joaquin (2002) 96 Cal.App.4th 1357, 1368.) Petitioners may file an amended verified petition, with a request for an immediate stay, that sets forth in detail the reasons for the delay in seeking relief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits filed in support of Petition for Writ of Mandate (Vol. 2/2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits filed in support of Petition for Writ of Mandate (Vol. 1/2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate filed ***STAY REQUESTED***

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&N FINANCING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Balderrama, Francisco V

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN OLIVIA NGOC