This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/12/2022 at 21:05:48 (UTC).

MITCHELL v. S.C. (RUTAGANIRA)

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 MITCHELL filed an Other lawsuit against C RUTAGANIRA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2905

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Krista Mitchell

Respondent

Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

Thomas F. Rutaganira

Veronique N. Bikoba

Dawn Wigeri Van Edema

Keith M. Banks

Pakpour Banks LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ernest Krause

Interested Party Attorney

Rachel E. Renno

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/27/2022

DispositionDescription: Application for Relief from Default Denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Counsel and all parties: The court has considered your application for relief from default and petition for review. Your application for relief from default has been denied. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.60(d).) On this date, we hereby return to you unfiled your documents.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022

DocketDescription: Application for relief from default denied (case closed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022

DocketDescription: Application for relief from default filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022

DocketDescription: Time for ordering review extended on the court's own motion; Notes: Having received the petition for review within the Court's original jurisdiction, the time for ordering review on the court's own motion is hereby extended to and including February 25, 2022. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(c).)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022

DocketDescription: Received untimely petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: Krista Mitchell Attorney: Ernest Krause

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C095375; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CV20210248

[+] Read More [-] Read Less