Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/23/2021 at 16:33:28 (UTC).

Mission Surgical Clinic, Inc. v. The Superior Court; Julie Garrido

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 Mission Surgical Clinic, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Julie Garrido. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucky IV, L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5689

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lucky IV, L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mission Surgical Clinic, Inc.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Julie Garrido

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jeffrey David Tucker

Attorney at Creason Tucker Alexander, LLP

32 Executive Park , Suite 105

Irvine, CA 92614

James A. Creason

Attorney at Creason Tucker Alexander, LLP

32 Executive Park, Suite 105

Irvine, CA 92614

Interested Party Attorneys

Daniel M. Hodes

Attorney at Hodes Milman Liebeck

9210 Irvine Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Jennifer R. Johnson

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer R. Johnson, APC

9210 Irvine Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final; Author: Menetrez, Frank J.; Participants: Slough, Marsha Miller, Douglas P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Petitioner's request for dismissal of the petition for writ of mandate/prohibition is granted and the petition for writ of mandate/prohibition is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Request for dismissal with superior court heading and case number by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The Jan 15, 2021, order is vacated. The court directs petitioner to file either a request for dismissal or a report on the status of the settlement on or before 45 days from the date of this order. If petitioner fails to timely comply, the case will proceed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Real party in interest is to serve and file a request for dismissal on or before 45 days from the date of this order. If request is not timely filed, case will proceed.Vacated, per order of Jan 20, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of settlement by RPI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo; Notes: argue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Traverse to return filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: Respondent or RPI may file a formal return w/in 25 days of the date of this order. Petitioner shall file a traverse no later than 15 days from the date of the last return. Parties will be notified when the matter is set for oral argument

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: by petitioner to RPI's response to the petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Real Party In interest's Exhibits to the response - 1 volume

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: RPI response to petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Notice of lodging Exhibit P; reporter's transcript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 1 vol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate/Prohibition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A. Creason