This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 12/04/2021 at 02:41:14 (UTC).

Miranda v. Contreras

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Miranda filed an Other lawsuit against Contreras. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Court, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1454

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Court, Michelle

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Rafael David Miranda

Defendant and Appellant

Andres Contreras

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Hankin Etess

1562 Glen Oaks Blvd Floor 2

Pasadena, CA 91105

Paul W. Chandler

Attorney at Chandler Law Firm, APC

5150 E. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 200

Long Beach, CA 90804

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Robert Alan Fine

Attorney at Law Office of Robert Alan Fine

7122 Beverly Blvd Ste A

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondent to recover costs on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final; Author: Grimes, Elizabeth A.; Participants: Wiley Jr., John Shepard Harutunian III, Albert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Denied - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Rafael David Miranda Attorney: Paul W. Chandler Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT permission to file respondents supplemental brief is granted. Respondent's supplemental brief is deemed filed October 28, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: SPB from Respondent, sent to Justice Grimes for permission to file late SPB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Andres Contreras Attorney: Robert Alan Fine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Rafael David MirandaAttorney: Paul W. Chandler; Notes: Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (after record).; Notes: Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Andres Contreras Attorney: Robert Alan Fine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Andres ContrerasAttorney: Robert Alan Fine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 paid via cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated March 23, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: March 17, 2021: Andres Contreras

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC578257; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC609929; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC610496; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC609928; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC605638; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC697314; Trial Court Judge: Court, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ETESS MICHAEL HANKIN ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANDLER PAUL W.