This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/14/2023 at 00:00:26 (UTC).

MINER'S CAMP v. FORESTHILL PUBLIC UTILITY DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 MINER'S CAMP filed an Other lawsuit against FORESTHILL PUBLIC UTILITY DISTRICT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5666

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Miner's Camp, LLC

Appellant and Defendant

Foresthill Public Utility District

Not Yet Classified

Jack Cohen

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence E. Skidmore

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Eric Nelson Robinson

William T. Chisum

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Jack Cohen

Laura Elizabeth Dougherty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2022

DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022

DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed); Notes: The requests for an order directing publication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal are denied. Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022

DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2022

DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association Attorney: Laura Elizabeth Dougherty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2022

DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Jack Cohen Attorney: Jack Cohen The request for publication has been considered and is denied for the reason that the Court of Appeal does not find said opinion meets the criteria for publication as set forth in rule 8.1105(c).C088828 & C090055 were consolidated by the Court of Appeal order filed on 9/27/2019.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C090055 C088828 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Placer County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: SCV0039661

[+] Read More [-] Read Less