This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/12/2022 at 15:36:19 (UTC).

Miller v. Axon Enterprise, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Miller filed an Other lawsuit against Axon Enterprise, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mesiwala, Shama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4941

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mesiwala, Shama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Carl L. Miller

Sacramento, CA 95825

Defendant and Respondent

Axon Enterprise, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Pamela B. Petersen

Attorney at Attorney at Law

Axon Enterprise, Inc. 17800 N. 85Th Street

Scottsdale, AZ 85255-9603

Elizabeth V. McNulty

Attorney at Evans Fears & Schuttert LLP

4440 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 250

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Craig J. Erickson

Attorney at Evans Fears & Shuttert LLP

4440 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 250

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Mr. Miller. Rejecting the supporting documents submitted on 3/4/2022 at the direction of the court. There are no provisions in the Rules of Court for filing these supporting documents.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's supporting documents submitted on 3/4/2022. (See letter dated 03/25/2022, for details.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Appellant's amended notice designating record on appeal, filed in the trial court on 3/4/2022, designating CT and RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 03/08/2022; designating additional documents for clerk's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Respondent's notice designating the record on appeal submitted on 3/4/2022 is rejected. This document must be filed in the superior court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 2/15/22; designating CT and RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appeal not selected for mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered not eligible for mediation.; Notes: HOCH, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent granted to 02/07/22 to file Civil Appeal Mediation Statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's Civil Case Information Statement and Appellant's Civil Appeal Mediation Statement received on 11/30/21 returned unfiled for insufficient proof of service. See letter sent this date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The request of Pamela B. Petersen to appear as counsel pro hac vice for respondent, Axon Enterprise, Inc., is granted. RAYE, P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice application; Notes: by attorney Pamela B. Petersen to appear as counsel on behalf of respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: respondent, adding attorney Pamela B. Petersen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement and Appellant's Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due: 12/03/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's. Receipt number: R325123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant files.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellant's Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due: 10/29/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 9/27/21. Personal injury.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34202000285421CUPLGDS; Trial Court Judge: Mesiwala, Shama

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TASER INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig J. Erickson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNULTY, ELIZABETH V