This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/30/2022 at 00:02:27 (UTC).

MILDER v. HOLLEY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 MILDER filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against HOLLEY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2888

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Andrew Milder

Respondents and Defendants

Shawn Holley

Kinsella, Weitzman, Iser, Kump & Aldisert, LLP.

Not Yet Classified

Bus & Prof code 17209/17536.5/126569(a)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan B. Cole

Mark Schaeffer

Marshall R. Cole

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended proof of service showing document served was a petition for review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: amended proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Andrew Milder Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303175 B298984 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC581072

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less