This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/20/2022 at 01:04:53 (UTC).

Micron Technology, Inc. v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Micron Technology, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9606

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rudy, Christopher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Micron Technology, Inc.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

191 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Interested Party

Allied Telesis, K.K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert Scott Shwarts

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

405 Howard St

San Francisco, CA 94105-2669

Catherine Y Lui

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

405 Howard St

San Francisco, CA 94105

Rebecca Clair Harlow

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

The Orrick Building 405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2669

Interested Party Attorneys

Kevin M Papay

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Phillip Jared Wiese

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Benjamin Patrick Smith

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1420

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record purged - to be shipped to state records center.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Petitioner's motion to seal is granted. The clerk of this court is directed to lodge the unredacted exhibits under seal forthwith. The petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief and the request for stay are denied. (FDE, AMG, CCL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Real party in interest responding to Petitioner's 1/5/2022 letter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Petitioner renewing its request for a 1/10/22 stay before trial begins.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Supplemental Declaration of Catherine Y. Lui in Support of Petitioner's Motion to Permit Lodging of Confidential Writ Exhibits Conditionally Under Seal in the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Robert S. Shwarts, counsel for petitioner, in response to the December 14, 2021 letter from Real Party In Interest Allied Telesis, K.K. opposing Micron's Petition for Writ of Mandate, Prohibition, or Other Appropriate Relief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Submitted by Allied Telesis, K.K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: Real Party in Interest informing the court the petition for writ of mandate filed on 12/6 merits summary denial. For that reason, Real Party in Interest will not file a preliminary opposition unless the court requests one.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Volumes 1-6; Volume 4 redacted, Volume 4 conditionally sealed ***CORRECTED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petitioner's motion and declaration on Real Party in Interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Exhibits: Volumes 1-6; Volume 4 redacted, Volume 4 conditionally sealed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Attorney Catherine Y. Lui in Support of Petitioner's Motion to Permit Lodging of Confidential Writ Exhibits Conditionally Under Seal in the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Petitioner's Motion to Permit Lodging of Confidential Writ Exhibits Conditionally Under Seal in the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition, or Other Appropriate Relief ***STAY REQUESTED 1/10/22***Proof of service included showing service of petition and exhibits on Respondent and Real Party in Interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Patrick Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin M Papay