This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/16/2022 at 03:11:35 (UTC).

Michelle Yaney v. The Superior Court; Raymond Turner

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Michelle Yaney filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Raymond Turner. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Klatchko, Kira. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8058

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Klatchko, Kira

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michelle Stopyra Yaney

Santa Barbara, CA 93105

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Raymond Turner

Desert Hot Springs, CA 92240

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: Raphael Slough Menetrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Amended petition needs to include table of contents and table of authorities, please attach proof of service to the petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Petitioner re: amended petition to include table of contents and table of authorities.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Amended petition needs to include table of contents and table of authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Coram Vobis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: By petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant