This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/27/2021 at 02:03:28 (UTC).

MICHAELS v. GREENBERG TRAURIG

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 MICHAELS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against GREENBERG TRAURIG. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8617

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Jillian Michaels

Empowered Media, LLC.

Respondents and Defendants

Greenberg Traurig, LLP

David P. Markman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Steven Busch

Attorney at King & Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1100

Century City, CA 90067

Richard S. Busch

Attorney at King & Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1100

Century City, CA 90067

Darren Keith Kelly

Attorney at King & Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4618

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Kirsten Hicks Spira

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP,

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael P. McNamara

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 box containing 4 doghouses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. Kruger, J., was recused and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jillian Michaels Attorney: Richard S. Busch Plaintiff and Appellant: Empowered Media, LLC. Attorney: Richard Steven Busch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: one full box containing four doghouses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Greenberg Traurig, LLP Attorney: Michael P. McNamara Defendant and Respondent: David P. Markman Attorney: Michael P. McNamara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B300093; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: SC126100

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Empowered Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUSCH RICHARD S.