This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/14/2022 at 00:50:15 (UTC).

Michael Snyder v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Michael Snyder filed an Other lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarville, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9873

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McCarville, Brian

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Michael Snyder

Appellant and Defendant

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard M. Wirtz

Attorney at Wirtz Law APC

4370 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92122

Norman F. Taylor

Attorney at Norman Taylor & Associates

425 West Broadway, Suite 220

Glendale, CA 91204

Amy Rebecca Smith

Attorney at Wirtz Law APC

4370 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92122

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Patrick Sweeney

Attorney at Sweeney, APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Michael Caling Yu

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Jane Minkyung Chung

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Catherine K. Fong

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Nicholas S. Maugeri, II

Attorney at Sweeney APC

21515 Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 640

Torrance, CA 90503

Amir M. Nassihi

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nalani Lin Crisologo

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sept 26, 2022; Nissan North America, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVDS2012160; Trial Court Judge: McCarville, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUNG JANE MINKYUNG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NASSIHI AMIR M.