This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/23/2023 at 13:05:47 (UTC).

MGP IX Properties, LLC v. Ahmad Towfik

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 MGP IX Properties, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Ahmad Towfik. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marquez, Raquel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9918

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Marquez, Raquel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

MGP IX Properties, LLC

Defendant and Appellant

Ahmad A. Towfik

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Christopher Duringer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: (375 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Ahmad A. Towfik Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/16/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: MGP IX Properties, LLCAttorney: Stephen Christopher Duringer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Ahmad A. TowfikPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: AOB; must be served on trial court Appendix; Table of Contents must include where Volumes 2 and 3 begin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: AOB Missing: Table of Contents Table of Authorities Bookmarks Proof of Service should be filed with the Brief, not as a separate document Pagination begins as page 1 on the cover page Appendix Missing: Alphabetical and Chronological Index Notice of Appeal Appellant's Designations Register of Actions Bookmarks Cover must state that this is appellant's and respondent's joint appendix or, if not a joint appendix, opposing counsel must be removed from the cover. A joint appendix must include a stipulation to the documents that are included in the appendix Pagination begins as page 1 on the cover page

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Ahmad A. Towfik Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Ahmad A. TowfikPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended; dtd Jan 06, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: The Duringer Law Group, PLC old address 1: 181 S. Old Springs Road, 2nd Floor new address 1: 181 S. Old Springs Road, 1st Floor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Dec 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: from appellant; dtd Oct 31, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: from appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Oct 3, 2022; Ahmad A. Towfik

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: CVSW2001012; Trial Court Judge: Marquez, Raquel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less