This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/13/2021 at 13:44:33 (UTC).

Mentor Management, Inc. et al. v. The Superior Court; Daniel Garcia

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Mentor Management, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Daniel Garcia. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvarez, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6367

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alvarez, Donald

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Mentor Management, Inc.

Chantal Smith

Horrigan Cole Enterprises, Inc.

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Bernardino County

Interested Party

Daniel Arteaga Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Shaye Nicole Schrick

Attorney at Delfino Madden O'Malley Coyle & Koewler LLP

500 Capitol Mall Ste 1550

Sacramento, CA 95814

Daniel John Coyle

Attorney at Delfino Madden O'Malley Coyle & Koewler LLP

500 Capitol Mall Ste 1550

Sacramento, CA 95814-4749

Caroline Mae Colangelo

Attorney at Delfino Madden O'Malley Coyle & Koewler LLP

500 Capitol Mall Ste 1550

Sacramento, CA 95814

Interested Party Attorneys

Mark James Skapik

Attorney at Skapik Law Group

5861 Pine Ave Suite A-1

Chino Hills, CA 91709

Geralyn L. Skapik

Attorney at Skapik Law Group

5861 Pine Avenue, Suite A-1

Chino Hills, CA 91709

Blair Jeffrey Berkley

Attorney at Skapik Law Group

5861 Pine Avenue, Suite A-1

Chino Hills, CA 91709

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: McKinster Raphael Fields Request for immediate stay is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 5 vols. (1167 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Petition; remove errata from the cover, if petition is amended please indicate that on the cover, case number is missing from the cover vols 1-5 exhibits, exhibit master index; remove errata from the cover, case number is missing from the cover

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Re Petition: File POS showing service on the trial court Re Exhibit Master Index & Exhibits 1) Master Index - must be paginated and bookmarked; include dates of exhibits on index 2) must include inclusive volume numbers and page numbers on all volume covers; Each bookmark to an exhibit/attachment must include the letter/number and a description of the and a description of the exh/attachment;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Prohibition or other appropriate relief; Request for immediate stay of portions of Nov 4, 2020 discovery order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mentor Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Horrigan Cole Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Bernardino County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline Mae Colangelo