This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/20/2023 at 07:46:08 (UTC).

Mendocino Farms Wage and Hour Cases

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 Mendocino Farms Wage and Hour Cases was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Damrell, Lauri. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6869

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Damrell, Lauri

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Sean Lalor et al.

Yaneth Elias

Mendocino Farms, LLC

Appellant and Not Yet Classified

Michael Moreli

Respondent and Defendant

Mendocino Farms, LLC

Other

Judicial Council of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy B. Del Castillo

Attorney at Castle Law

2999 Douglas Blvd., Suite 180

Roseville, CA 95661

Kent L. Bradbury

Attorney at Castle Law

2999 Douglas Blvd., Suite 180

Roseville, CA 95661

Scott Ashford Brooks

Attorney at Matern Law Group, P.C.

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Evelyn F. Wang

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Janet Lynn Grumer

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Allen Willis Graves

Attorney at The Graves Firm

122 N Baldwin Avenue, Main Floor

Sierra Madre, CA 91024

Jacqueline S. Treu

Attorney at The Graves Firm

122 N Baldwin Avenue, Main Floor

Sierra Madre, CA 91024

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Evelyn F. Wang

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Janet Lynn Grumer

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorney

Coordination Attorney

Attorney at Judicial Council of California

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102-3688

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: 1 volume reporter's transcript (64 pp.) Appellant's appendix and opening brief due: 01/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 10/27/22. Designating appendix and reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appeal not selected for mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered not eligible for mediation.; Notes: HOCH, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.; Notes: By Respondent Mendocino Farms,LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: appellant's counsel advising Business and Professions Code section 17209 may apply to this appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondents' civil appeal mediation statements due: 10/3/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant files.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: appellant's counsel advising that the Civil Appeal Mediation Statement is due by 9/22/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 8/17/22. Class action settlement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP5153; Trial Court Judge: Damrell, Lauri

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where MENDOCINO FARMS INC.; A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant