This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/23/2023 at 00:13:27 (UTC).

McPhillip v. Kokkalis et al.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 McPhillip filed an Other lawsuit against Kokkalis. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0459

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rudy, Christopher

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Vincent McPhillip

Respondents and Defendants

Nicolas Kokkalis

Chengdiao Fan

Social Chain, Inc.

Pi Community Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara Cristina Colon

Attorney at Brown, Neri, Smith & Khan, LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2080

Los Angeles, CA 90025-389

Ethan Joseph Brown

Attorney at Brown, Neri, Smith & Khan, LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2080

Los Angeles, CA 90025-389

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Troy Anthony Valdez

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kenneth Paul Nabity

Attorney at Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP

1 Montgomery St Ste 3000

San Francisco, CA 94104-5500

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcript Vol. 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Filed by Ethan J. Brown obo appellant with attached judgment of 9/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's certificate of compliance, filed 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 10/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: The $100 fee has not been deposited 8.100(b)(2). Notice designating reporter's transcript or notice of intent to proceed without reporter's transcript not timely filed. Notice designating record for clerk's transcript not timely filed. Filed 10/10/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Vincent McPhillip, filed 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV368601; Trial Court Judge: Rudy, Christopher

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NABITY KENNETH PAUL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Valdez, Troy A