This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/18/2022 at 01:46:29 (UTC).

McKenna v. Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 McKenna filed an Other lawsuit against Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ford III, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0814

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ford III, Harry

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Paule McKenna

Palm Desert, CA 92260

Respondents and Defendants

Boss Film Productions, Inc.

Visiona Romantica, Inc.

Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Louis Peter Petrich

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP,

2029 Century Park East Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Elizabeth Lee Schilken

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park E Ste 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: (Consolidated Brief)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Paule McKenna Pro Per (Consolidated brief)[ AOB + 14 after supplemental record filed ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/01/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.Attorney: Elizabeth Lee Schilken Attorney: Louis Peter Petrich Defendant and Respondent: Boss Film Productions, Inc. Defendant and Respondent: Visiona Romantica, Inc.; Notes: (Consolidated Brief)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Paule McKennaPro Per; Notes: (Consolidated brief)[ AOB + 14 after supplemental record filed ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Paule McKenna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: in re omission letter dtd 3.2.2022ONE: Supplemental Clerk (59 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's application for extension of time to file the combined opening brief is granted to 14 days after the supplemental record is filed in case B310814.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: SCLA Civil Appeals in re omission letter dtd 3.2.2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Appellant's "omission letter of designation of record"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Appellant's application for an extension of time to file appellant's reply brief to 14 days after the augmented record is filed[ Per appellant, please do not rule on this request yet. Another motion will be filed. ] [ UPDATE 03/07/22 : Per appellant, no motion to be filed, please forward to court for ruling. ]

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Respondent's opposition to motion to correct filing notice of appeal per California Rule of Court 8.77(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Paule McKenna Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Paule McKennaPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate Appeals...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee Waiver granted on Oct 7, 2020 for case B304256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to Correct Filing Notice of Appeal...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Case information statement rejected via TrueFiling. Appellant indicated he had previously been granted a fee waiver. Appellant advised to file an application for waiver of court fees with the 2DCA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Feb 10, 2021 by Paule McKenna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19SMCV01329; Trial Court Judge: Ford III, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISIONA ROMANTICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant