***6605
11/15/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Other
Statewide, California
Lui, Christopher
Bonnie McKee
Bonnie McKee Music
Nicky Stein
Clintons Solicitors
Clintons Law Corporation
Elizabeth G. Chilton
Andrew Goodman
Patricia L. Glaser
Robert Edward Allen
Corey E. Klein
Bert H. Deixler
Bradley Robert Schneider
Sarah E. Moses
Court documents are not available for this case.
DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Attorney: Andrew Goodman Attorney: Elizabeth G. Chilton Attorney: Patricia L. Glaser Attorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Music
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKeeAttorney: Andrew Goodman Attorney: Elizabeth G. Chilton Attorney: Patricia L. Glaser Attorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Music
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Respondent's letter re counsel no longer with firm
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Nicky Stein Attorney: Bert H. Deixler Attorney: Bradley Robert Schneider Attorney: Corey E. Klein Defendant and Respondent: Clintons Solicitors Defendant and Respondent: Clintons Law Corporation
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Nicky SteinAttorney: Bert H. Deixler Attorney: Bradley Robert Schneider Attorney: Corey E. Klein Defendant and Respondent: Clintons Solicitors Defendant and Respondent: Clintons Law Corporation
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: RBF was due 9/6/2022
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Attorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Music Attorney: Robert Edward Allen [Two volumes of appendix]One extension granted for a total of 30 days: 05/19/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 06/17/2022 By 30 Day(s)
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKeeAttorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee MusicAttorney: Robert Edward Allen; Notes: [Two volumes of appendix]One extension granted for a total of 30 days: 05/19/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 06/17/2022 By 30 Day(s)
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: AAO was due 6/17/22
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The court has read and considered the application for pro hac vice admission of Andrew J. Goodman to appear as counsel for appellant Bonnie McKee filed on February 1, 2022. Good cause appearing, the application is granted.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Appellant's motion for pro hac vice admission of Andrew J. Goodman.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #398017 for $775
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Attorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Music Attorney: Robert Edward Allen
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKeeAttorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee MusicAttorney: Robert Edward Allen
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 18, 2021
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 15, 2021 by Bonnie McKee et al.
[-] Read LessDocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV32936; Trial Court Judge: Lui, Christopher
[-] Read Less