This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/22/2023 at 22:15:03 (UTC).

McKee et al. v. Stein et al.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 McKee filed an Other lawsuit against Stein. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lui, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6605

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lui, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Bonnie McKee

Bonnie McKee Music

Defendants and Respondents

Nicky Stein

Clintons Solicitors

Clintons Law Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Andrew Goodman

Patricia L. Glaser

Robert Edward Allen

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Corey E. Klein

Bert H. Deixler

Bradley Robert Schneider

Sarah E. Moses

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Attorney: Andrew Goodman Attorney: Elizabeth G. Chilton Attorney: Patricia L. Glaser Attorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Music

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKeeAttorney: Andrew Goodman Attorney: Elizabeth G. Chilton Attorney: Patricia L. Glaser Attorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Music

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Respondent's letter re counsel no longer with firm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Nicky Stein Attorney: Bert H. Deixler Attorney: Bradley Robert Schneider Attorney: Corey E. Klein Defendant and Respondent: Clintons Solicitors Defendant and Respondent: Clintons Law Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Nicky SteinAttorney: Bert H. Deixler Attorney: Bradley Robert Schneider Attorney: Corey E. Klein Defendant and Respondent: Clintons Solicitors Defendant and Respondent: Clintons Law Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: RBF was due 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Attorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Music Attorney: Robert Edward Allen [Two volumes of appendix]One extension granted for a total of 30 days: 05/19/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 06/17/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKeeAttorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee MusicAttorney: Robert Edward Allen; Notes: [Two volumes of appendix]One extension granted for a total of 30 days: 05/19/2022 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 06/17/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: AAO was due 6/17/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The court has read and considered the application for pro hac vice admission of Andrew J. Goodman to appear as counsel for appellant Bonnie McKee filed on February 1, 2022. Good cause appearing, the application is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Appellant's motion for pro hac vice admission of Andrew J. Goodman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #398017 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Attorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee Music Attorney: Robert Edward Allen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKeeAttorney: Robert Edward Allen Plaintiff and Appellant: Bonnie McKee MusicAttorney: Robert Edward Allen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 18, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 15, 2021 by Bonnie McKee et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV32936; Trial Court Judge: Lui, Christopher

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less