This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/21/2021 at 01:32:26 (UTC).

McGARRY v. AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 McGARRY filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8345

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Tim McGarry

Respondent and Defendant

AvalonBay Communities, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Martin Nebrida Buchanan

Attorney at Law Offices of Martin N. Buchanan, APC

655 West Broadway, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Kaye Scripps

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Matthew Gregory Kleiner

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including July 19, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tim McGarry Attorney: Martin Nebrida Buchanan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: AvalonBay Communities, Inc. Attorney: Matthew Gregory Kleiner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D076859; Disposition: Reversed & remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2018-00016756-CU-PO-CTL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLEINER MATTHEW GREGORY