This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/18/2023 at 11:54:39 (UTC).

McCormack et al. v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 McCormack filed an Other lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loveder, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1849

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Loveder, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Garrett Guy

Kevin McCormack

Appellant and Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Jennifer Dale Bennett

Tionna Grace Dolin

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Amir M Nassihi

Andrew Lu-Young Chang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Misc. fee received for:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 07/31/2023 By 62 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Ford Motor Company Attorney: Amir M Nassihi Two extensions granted for a total of 92 days: 01/10/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed:. Due on 03/13/2023 By 62 Day(s) 03/21/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/28/2023 By 30 Day(s) LAST EXTENSIONTwo extensions granted for a total of 92 days: 01/10/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed:. Due on 03/13/2023 By 62 Day(s) 03/21/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/28/2023 By 30 Day(s) LAST EXTENSION1 appendix, pages 1-143

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/31/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Garrett GuyAttorney: Jennifer Dale Bennett Attorney: Tionna Grace Dolin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Ford Motor CompanyAttorney: Amir M Nassihi; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 92 days: 01/10/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed:. Due on 03/13/2023 By 62 Day(s) 03/21/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/28/2023 By 30 Day(s) LAST EXTENSIONTwo extensions granted for a total of 92 days: 01/10/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed:. Due on 03/13/2023 By 62 Day(s) 03/21/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/28/2023 By 30 Day(s) LAST EXTENSION1 appendix, pages 1-143

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: LAST EXTENSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: By appellant regarding extension.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Aplt's extension application: Incorrect information on document; 1. Brief is now due 03/29/23 not 03/13/23 and 2. Rule 8.220 default notice was issued on 03/14/23. Please correct and resend.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Appellant's notice of appearance. Andrew L. Chang will now be the lead attorney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent associates Jennifer Bennett, Gupta Wessler PLLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: 1 RT, pages 1-7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: M. Webb

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 10-06-2022 (Proceeding under rule 8.124 with RT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant Ford Motor Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2021-01236168; Trial Court Judge: Loveder, James

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less