This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/28/2022 at 01:55:00 (UTC).

McCarty v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals et al.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 McCarty filed an Other lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keosian, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3796

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keosian, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Kody McCarty

Respondent

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorney

Franklin L. Ferguson, Jr.

3580 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1732

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Respondent Attorneys

Brian M. Meadows

Attorney at LaFollette Johnson DeHaas Fesler & Ames

2677 N Main St #901

Santa Ana, CA 92705-6632

Matthew S. Levinson

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Myra A. Firth

Attorney at LaFollette, Johnson, DeHaas, Fesler & Am

2677 N. Main Street, 9Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Matthew Samuel Levinson

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Brian Michael Meadows

2677 N Main St #901

Santa Ana, CA 92705-6632

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Due on 01/18/2022 By 63 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: [...] The final determination of whether the appeal was taken from an appealable order is deferred to the panel in the division that will hear the appeal with the benefit of a full record and parties' principal briefs. The clerk's August 26, 2021 notice is discharged. (See order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Requested for 01/18/2022 By 63 Day(s) Request for extension of time to Jan 15, 2022 to file AAO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Due on 11/16/2021 By 60 Day(s) Extended to 11/16/2021. No further extensions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Requested for 11/16/2021 By 60 Day(s) Request for extension of time to 11/16/2021 to file AAO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to clerk's August 26, 2021 letter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: After reviewing appellant's civil case information statement filed on August 23, 2021, it appears the appeal filed on June 25, 2021 was taken from a nonappealable order. (Code Civ. Proc., 1294.) Appellant is hereby requested to demonstrate in writing why the appeal should not be dismissed as having been taken from a nonappealable order, within 15 days of the date of this notice. Respondent may file a reply to the response within 10 days of the response file date. Failure by the appellant to respond within the time provided may result in the appeal being dismissed as taken from a nonappealable order. (Sherman v. Standard Mines Co. (1913) 166 Cal. 524, 525.) Any response shall have attached to it a proof of service. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25 (a)(1)-(2).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 9, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Kody McCarty Attorney: Franklin L. Ferguson, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Kody McCartyAttorney: Franklin L. Ferguson, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (6/25/2021 by Kody McCarty ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Matthew S Levinson of Cole Pedroza LLP associates in as co-counsel of record for respondent Kaiser Foundation Hospitals et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check#1148 for $775.00 (Kody C McCarty)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 6/25/2021 by Kody McCarty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCP00455; Trial Court Judge: Keosian, Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Myra A. Firth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINSON MATTHEW SAMUEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEADOWS BRIAN M.