Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/04/2021 at 00:02:25 (UTC).

McCarthy et al. v. California Coastal Commission

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 McCarthy filed an Other lawsuit against California Coastal Commission. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coates, Tana. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9078

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 6

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coates, Tana

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Appellants

Robert Edwin McCarthy

Judith McCarthy

Judith Tuttle McCarthy, as Co-Trustee of the R&J McCarthy, III Family Trust

Robert Wdwin McCarthy, as Co-Trustee of the R & J McCarthy, III Family Trust

California Coastal Commission

Respondent and Appellant

California Coastal Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorneys

John J. Flynn

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

18101 Von Karman Ave. Suite 1800

Irvine, CA 92612

Gregory William Sanders

Attorney at Nossaman Guthner Knox et al

18101 Von Karman Ave #1800

Irvine, CA 92715

Andrew Marc Vogel

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring St. Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Respondent Attorney

Andrew Marc Vogel

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring St. Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: Administrative record received **********.; Notes: Administrative record (1-10-13 & 8-15-13)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: AMENDED Notice to Reporter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: SLOSC Clerk's Declaration re Transcript Designations on Appeal; Additional deposit for RT is required re designation filed 12/3/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: SLOSC Clerk's Declaration re Transcript Designations on Appeal; Certain documents are not part of the court record and must be corrected within 10 days (CA Coastal Commission)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: SLOSC Clerk's Declaration re Transcript Designations on Appeal; Certain documents are not part of the court record and must be corrected within 10 days (McCarthy et al.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 1/8/21; CT, RT, and Administrative Record for x-appeal filed 12-10-20 by CA Coastal Commission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: for x-appeal filed 12-10-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: California Coastal Commission Attorney: Andrew Marc Vogel Notice of CROSS-APPEAL dtd 12-10-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: California Coastal CommissionAttorney: Andrew Marc Vogel; Notes: Notice of CROSS-APPEAL dtd 12-10-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Robert Edwin McCarthy Attorney: John J. Flynn Petitioner and Appellant: Judith McCarthy Attorney: John J. Flynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; missing appealable order/judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Robert Edwin McCarthyAttorney: John J. Flynn Petitioner and Appellant: Judith McCarthyAttorney: John J. Flynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of CROSS-APPEAL dtd 12-10-20 by CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION; from 11-2-20 judgment after court trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/3/20; CT, RT, and Administrative record (1-10-13 & 8-15-13) for N/A dtd 11-23-20 by aplt. MCCARTHY ET AL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 11-23-20 by aplt. MCCARTHY ET AL., from 11-2-20 judgment after court trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: CV130110; Trial Court Judge: Coates, Tana

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA COASTALCOMMISSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOGEL ANDREW M. ESQ.