This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/27/2021 at 03:22:56 (UTC).

M.B. v. Superior Court for the County of Del Norte

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 M B filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Del Norte. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Follett, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2320

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Follett, William

 

Party Details

Petitioner

M. B.

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Del Norte

Interested Parties

L. M.

Del Norte County Department of Health & Social Services

B. M.

H. O.

T. M.

M. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Michael Svend Skudstad

P.O. Box 38

Crescent City, CA 95531-0038

Office Of The County Counsel

981 "H" Street - Suite 220

Crescent City, CA 95531

David Owen Cooper

550 H Street, Suite 1S

Crescent City, CA 95531-8512

Keith Vernon Morris

Attorney at Keith Morris, Attorney at Law

341 H St

Crescent City, CA 95531-4017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: In that neither counsel for petitioner nor petitioner acting in propria persona filed a petition for extraordinary writ within the time permitted (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.452(c)(l)) the above-entitled action is dismissed as abandoned. (Karl S. v. Superior Court (1995) 34 Cal.App.4th 1397, 1404.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Notes: BY THE COURT: In that neither counsel for petitioner nor petitioner acting in propria persona filed a petition for extraordinary writ within the time permitted (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.452(c)(l)) the above-entitled action is dismissed as abandoned. (Karl S. v. Superior Court (1995) 34 Cal.App.4th 1397, 1404.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: all parties stating the petition is due May 3, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: Two volumes of Clerk's Transcripts filed Reporter's Transcript Filed - Volumes 1 - 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Del Norte County Superior Court stating, "We just sent it off to you, you should be receiving it by Wednesday."

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Del Norte County Superior Court re overdue record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: W & I 366.26 Hearing is July 16, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: from B. M., father in pro per on two cases for two minors as follows: JVSQ146111 - Minor is L. M. JVSQ156145 - Minor is B. M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Del Norte County Superior Court; County: Del Norte; Trial Court Case Number: JVSQ146111; Trial Court Judge: Follett, William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Del Norte County Superior Court; County: Del Norte; Trial Court Case Number: JVSQ156145; Trial Court Judge: Follett, William

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Del Norte County Department of Health and Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Solano is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith Vernon Morris