This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/12/2023 at 20:04:36 (UTC).

Matthew G. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Matthew G filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clay III, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6129

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Clay III, Charles

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

M. G.

H. G.

M. V.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Department of Children and Family Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael Toshio Ono

Attorney at Children's Law Center

101 Centre Plaza Drive Clc3

Monterey Park, CA 91754-2179

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Charles Q Clay III

Los Angeles Superior Court 201 Centre Plaza Drive., Dept. 415

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Other Attorneys

Ileana Silver

Attorney at Law Offices of Amy Einstein

901 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 202

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Katherine Victoria Mitchell

Attorney at Los Angeles Dependency Lawyers

901 Corporate Center Dr. Suite 202

Monterey Park, CA 91754-7666

Benjamin Blinoff Mudd

Attorney at Children's Law Center

101 Centre Plaza Drive

Monterey Park, CA 91754

James Phillip Boyd

Attorney at Law Office of Rachel Ewing

901 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 580

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Yasmin Kayiran

Attorney at Children's Law Center

101 Centre Plaza Drive, Suite 8

Monterey Park, CA 91754-2179

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed February 1, 2023; the opposition to the petition by Father, filed February 3, 2023; and the opposition to the petition by minor M.G., filed February 3, 2023, have been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed February 1, 2023; the opposition to the petition by Father, filed February 3, 2023; and the opposition to the petition by minor M.G., filed February 3, 2023, have been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Minor M.G.'s preliminary opposition to petitioner's writ of mandate and request for stay.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Father's preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate and request for stay.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 1 volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate/Immediate Request for Stay (Child Safety Issue)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less