This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/30/2022 at 21:15:41 (UTC).

MATEEN-BRADFORD v. CITY OF COMPTON

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 MATEEN-BRADFORD filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF COMPTON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2133

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Kareemah Mateen-Bradford

Defendant and Appellant

City of Compton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich

Attorney at The Ehrlich Law Firm

237 West Fourth Street Second Floor

Claremont, CA 91711

Alyssa K. Schabloski

Attorney at Gladius Law APC

2708 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 426

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Norman A. DuPont

Attorney at Ring Bender LLP

3150 Bristol Street Suite 220

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Joseph S. Klapach

Attorney at Klapach & Klapach, P.C.

15303 Venturea Boulevard,#1510

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse (vol. 2 of 2), 1 file jacket (vol. 1 of 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Kareemah Mateen-Bradford Attorney: Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse (volume 2 of 2); one file jacket (volume 1 of 2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Certificate of interested entities.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: City of Compton Attorney: Joseph S. Klapach Attorney: Norman A. DuPont

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Kareemah Mateen-Bradford Attorney: Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B300491; Disposition: Reversed in Full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: TC026769

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF COMPTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUPONT NORMAN ARTHUR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph S. Klapach