This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/29/2021 at 02:05:12 (UTC).

Mashian Law Group v. Miles

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Mashian Law Group filed an Other lawsuit against Miles. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5132

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Mashian Law Group

Appellant and Defendant

Loren Miles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Laura K. Stanton

11726 San Vicente Blvd. Suite 290

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

James Boyd Allen

Attorney at Skousen Law

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (August 27, 2021 by Loren Miles ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by James Allen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on August 27, 2021 by Loren Miles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21SMCV00674

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASHIAN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL LEGAL CORPORATION is a litigant