This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/04/2023 at 20:04:37 (UTC).

Martinez v. Rechnitz

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Martinez filed an Other lawsuit against Rechnitz. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4828

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Arcelia Martinez

Appellants and Defendants

San Gabriel Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP

Rockport Administrative Services, LLC

Defendants

Schlomo Rechnitz

San Gabriel Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP

Rockport Administrative Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Stephen M. Garcia

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Sean David Cowdrey

Spencer Howard Jenkins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/02/2023

DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: filed 1/27/2023 SCLA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023

DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: email to appellant's counsel re case information statement due pursuant to rule 8.100(g), Calif. Rules of Court.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant ( November 22, 2022 by San Gabriel Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP and Rockport Administrative Services, LLC. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #403275 for $775 from lasc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on November 22, 2022 by San Gabriel Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP and Rockport Administrative Services, LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less