This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/10/2021 at 01:59:14 (UTC).

Martin v. Ford Motor Company et al.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Martin filed an Other lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Byrdsong, Rupert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1059

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Byrdsong, Rupert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Kristen F. Martin

Respondents and Defendants

Ford Motor Company

Worthington Ford, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Hallen D. Rosner

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Road Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Arlyn L Escalante

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Rd Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Payam Shahian

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1840 Century Park East, Suite #430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Derek J. Linkous

Attorney at Bush Seyferth PLLC

100 West Big Beaver Suite 400

Troy, MI 48084

Charles Frederick Harlow

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

650 California St Fl 19

San Francisco, CA 94108-2736

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 19, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Good cause appearing, the order of dismissal filed July 14, 2021, is vacated and the appeal filed March 3, 2021, is reinstated. Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by appellant's failure to perform acts required by the rules of court for procuring the record on appeal. Appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order perform any act for which the superior court has placed appellant in default. All acts (except for payment of fees) in compliance with this relief order are to be performed via the Los Angeles County Superior Court's electronic filing service provider. Payment of fees must be made at Room 111A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, California. Self-represented parties are not required to electronically file and may comply with this order at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111A, Los Angeles, California...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate dismissal; declaration of Arlyn Escalante.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed March 3, 2021, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Non-compliance from lasc filed June 30, 2021 - Failure to elect to proceed with or without a record of the oral proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is hereby ordered that the Application of Derek J. Linkous For Permission To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Application of Derek J. Linkous for permission To appear as counsel pro hac vice for Ford Motor Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kristen F. Martin Attorney: Arlyn L Escalante Attorney: Payam Shahian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellant associates in attorney Arlyn Escalante of Rosner, Barry & Babbitt as co-counsel of record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Kristen F. MartinAttorney: Arlyn L Escalante Attorney: Payam Shahian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check# 390951 for $775.00 (L.A. Depositions, Inc.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal and election to proceed by CRC 8.124 filed 3/3/2021 by Kristen F. Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV25660; Trial Court Judge: Byrdsong, Rupert

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Worthington Ford Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Payam Shahian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arlyn L Escalante