This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/26/2023 at 20:08:07 (UTC).

Martignetti v. Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 Martignetti filed an Other lawsuit against Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Court, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7194

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Court, Michelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Paul Edward Martignetti

Appellant and Defendant

Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Akop Jacob Nalbandyan

Charlene Lina Nercess

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Thomas R. Freeman

Ekwan Eric Rhow

Eric Christian Schwettmann

Jessica Alexis Gomez

Christopher Jumin Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/04/2023

HearingDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 11/13/2023 By 61 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Three Volumes of Exhibits.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. Attorney: Christopher Jumin Lee Attorney: Ekwan Eric Rhow Attorney: Thomas R. Freeman One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 05/05/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 08/04/2023 By 60 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketBrief: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Due Date: 12/04/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Paul Edward MartignettiAttorney: Akop Jacob Nalbandyan Attorney: Charlene Lina Nercess

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Paul Edward MartignettiAttorney: Akop Jacob Nalbandyan Attorney: Charlene Lina Nercess

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.Attorney: Christopher Jumin Lee Attorney: Ekwan Eric Rhow Attorney: Thomas R. Freeman; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 05/05/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 08/04/2023 By 60 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: ONE: reporter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. Attorney: Christopher Jumin Lee Attorney: Ekwan Eric Rhow Attorney: Thomas R. Freeman

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: The document submitted on March 24, 2023 is being returned to you for failure to provide the date of the notice of appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.Attorney: Christopher Jumin Lee Attorney: Ekwan Eric Rhow Attorney: Thomas R. Freeman

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 27, 2023: The appellant in this case has not been granted a waiver of the fees for preparing a clerk's transcript. I elect under rule 8.124(a) to use an appendix in Lieu of a clerk's transcript.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant $775 filing fee paid via credit card.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice filed 2/24/2023 SCLA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: notice of appeal filed 2/17/2023 - Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV18493; Trial Court Judge: Court, Michelle

[+] Read More [-] Read Less